Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Default Hearing filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Klossner, John D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKlossner, John D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 9 (Judicial Officer: Klossner, John D. )
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition or Application Index # 8
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 7
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 6
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Index # 5 (Judicial Officer: Klossner, John D. )
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 4 (Judicial Officer: Klossner, John D. )
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
November 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 3
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
November 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form 11.1 personal information Index # 2
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.