Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Support case in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2022 |
CategorySupport |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing by Party Index # 21 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 20 | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Department of Employment and Economic Development Index # 19 | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | DHS Case Summary-Child Support Index # 18 | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 16 | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 17 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 15 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing by Party Index # 14 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 13 | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing Index # 12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.