Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Default Hearing filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Klossner, John D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKlossner, John D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2022 |
CategoryCustody |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Index # 11
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 10
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Index # 9 (Judicial Officer: Klossner, John D. )
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Klossner, John D. )
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Index # 7
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Custody Index # 3
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Admission of Service Index # 5
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form 11.1 personal information Index # 6
Judge: Klossner, John D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.