Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ostlund, Travis David, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Soderbeck, Todd, in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Brosnahan, Amy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrosnahan, Amy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole Index #6
Date: January 20, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #5
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: December 30, 2022Eviction Summons Index #2
Date: December 20, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: December 17, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #7
Date: January 23, 2023Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Brosnahan, Amy R. Index #10
Date: March 31, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #9
Date: March 30, 2023Affidavit of Non-Compliance Index #8
Date: March 30, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Brosnahan, Amy R. Index #13
Date: April 28, 2023Notice of Deficiency Filed By: Plaintiff Ostlund, Travis David Index #12
Date: March 31, 2023Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #11
Date: March 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Brosnahan, Amy R. Index #13 | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Klossner, John D. | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Brosnahan, Amy R. Index #10 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Deficiency Filed By: Plaintiff Ostlund, Travis David Index #12 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #11 | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #9 | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Compliance Index #8 | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #7 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole Index #6 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.