Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brakemeier Properties, Inc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Hage, Brian Elliot - Lead Attorney, against Engquist, Jill, Michlitsch, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Klossner, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKlossner, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Defendant Engquist, Jill; Attorney HAGE, BRIAN ELLIOT; Defendant Michlitsch, Richard Index #21 | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Brosnahan, Amy R. Index #20 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Chantry, Amy | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Chantry, Amy )
Judge: Chantry, Amy |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Defendant Engquist, Jill; Attorney HAGE, BRIAN ELLIOT Index #19 | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 19 | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Defendant Engquist, Jill; Attorney HAGE, BRIAN ELLIOT; Defendant Michlitsch, Richard Index #18 | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.