Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eviction Hearing filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole )
Judge: Kralik, Nicole |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Index # 6 | |
November 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 5 | |
November 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Plaintiff Index # 3 | |
November 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Not Found Index # 4 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index # 2 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil Index # 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.