Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Trustone Financial Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Gallwas, Alexander Connor - Lead Attorney, against Solheim, Gregory Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
|
Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: November 24, 2022Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #7
Date: October 03, 2023Judgment Index #5
Date: January 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #7 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #5 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Defendant SOLHEIM, GREGORY JOSEPH; Plaintiff TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION Index #6 | |
January 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Lancaster, Peter Index #4 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Lancaster, Peter | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Lancaster, Peter )
Judge: Lancaster, Peter |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons and Notice Index #2 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Filed By: Defendant SOLHEIM, GREGORY JOSEPH; Plaintiff TRUSTONE FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION Index #3 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Index # 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.