Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Accounts Receivable Services, Llc Dba Reliance Recoveries As Successor In Interest To Allina Health System, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Torgerson, Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
|
Power of Attorney Index #1
Date: November 03, 2022Summons Index #3
Date: November 15, 2022Statement of Claim Index #2
Date: November 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #7 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole Index #6 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #5 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 5 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index #3 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Plaintiff Accounts Receivable Services, LLC dba Reliance Recoveries as successor in interest to Allina Health System Index #4 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index # 3 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.