Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Girtz, Mary, filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Schieferdecker, Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchieferdecker, Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2022 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
|
Medical Assistance Clearance Filed By: Attorney LARSON, GREGORY D Index #14
Date: November 16, 2022Proposed Order or Document Filed By: Attorney LARSON, GREGORY D Index #16
Date: November 22, 2022Will - Electronic Version Index #2
Date: October 05, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #3
Date: October 05, 2022Notice to Creditors Index #4
Date: October 11, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #7
Date: October 12, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #6
Date: October 11, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #5
Date: October 11, 2022Will - Electronic Version Index #8
Date: October 12, 2022Will Index #11
Date: October 12, 2022Affidavit of Service of Notice to the Comm of Human Services Index #9
Date: October 13, 2022Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #12
Date: October 20, 2022Affidavit of Publication Index #13
Date: October 31, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #17
Date: November 22, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #18
Date: December 13, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #19
Date: December 13, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #21
Date: December 21, 2022Correspondence Filed By: Attorney LARSON, GREGORY D Index #25
Date: January 10, 2023Inventory and Appraisement Filed By: Attorney LARSON, GREGORY D Index #23
Date: December 23, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #24
Date: December 29, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #27
Date: January 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Claims Due | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #27 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Frml Probate of Will-Appointment of Pers Rep-Unsup Judicial Officer: Schieferdecker, Eric P. Index #26 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Filed By: Attorney LARSON, GREGORY D Index #25 | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #24 | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisement Filed By: Attorney LARSON, GREGORY D Index #23 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Filed By: Personal Representative Girtz, Mary; Petitioner Girtz, Mary Index #22 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #21 | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Frml Probate of Will-Appointment of Pers Rep-Unsup Judicial Officer: Schieferdecker, Eric P. Index #20 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.