Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Clausen, Bridget Sharon, filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Tiffany, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTiffany, Robert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2022 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
|
Proposed Order or Document Filed By: Attorney MCGRATH, DANIEL SCOTT Index #5
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #8
Date: September 16, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #9
Date: September 16, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #12
Date: October 06, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #11
Date: October 06, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #7
Date: September 16, 2022Will Index #17
Date: August 16, 2022Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #2
Date: August 16, 2022Notice to Creditors Index #6
Date: September 16, 2022Affidavit of Publication Filed By: Attorney MCGRATH, DANIEL SCOTT Index #10
Date: October 05, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #4
Date: August 16, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #20
Date: January 25, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #15
Date: October 13, 2022Final Accounting Index #19
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #20 | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Accounting Index #19 | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Inventory Filed By: Personal Representative Clausen, Bridget Sharon; Petitioner Clausen, Bridget Sharon Index #18 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Claims Due | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #15 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Frml Probate of Will-Appointment of Pers Rep-Unsup Judicial Officer: Tiffany, Robert D. Index #14 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Filed By: Personal Representative Clausen, Bridget Sharon; Petitioner Clausen, Bridget Sharon Index #16 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #13 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 13 (Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler )
Judge: Annette, Tyler |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.