Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pratt, Stacey J, filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Schieferdecker, Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchieferdecker, Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2022 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
|
Notice to Creditors
Date: August 12, 2022Acceptance of Appointment and Oath
Date: August 05, 2022Renunciation of Right to Appointment or to Nominate
Date: August 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #52 | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Discharging Personal Representative Judicial Officer: Schieferdecker, Eric P. Filed By: Personal Representative Pratt, Stacey J; Petitioner Pratt, Stacey J Index #51 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative Filed By: Attorney HAUGEN, JOSHUA ERWIN Index #49 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipts for Assets by Distributee Index #48 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipts for Assets by Distributee Filed By: Attorney HAUGEN, JOSHUA ERWIN Index #47 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #50 | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #46 | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #45 | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service of Notice to the Comm of Human Services Filed By: Attorney HAUGEN, JOSHUA ERWIN Index #44 | |
May 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #43 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.