Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barclay, David James, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Young, Angela Dion, in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Tiffany, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTiffany, Robert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2022 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
Matter TypePaternity |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #14
Date: December 05, 2022Notice of Case Assignment Index #5
Date: October 10, 2022Partial Paternity Order Judicial Officer: Tiffany, Robert D. Index #18
Date: January 23, 2023Judgment of Paternity Index #19
Date: January 25, 2023Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #20
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment of Paternity Index #19 | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #20 | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Partial Paternity Order Judicial Officer: Tiffany, Robert D. Index #18 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Filed By: Attorney LINNEROOTH, RICHARD JAMES Index #17 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Hybrid
Judge: Tiffany, Robert D. |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index #16 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #14 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 14
Judge: Tiffany, Robert D. |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Respondent Young, Angela Dion Index #15 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 15
Judge: Tiffany, Robert D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.