Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cascade Funding Mortgage Trust Hb4, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rossman, Joseph Matthew - Lead Attorney, against Bjugstad, Tara, Remund, Jonathan, Remund, Karen, Remund, Kathleen, Remund, Robert N, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Tiffany, Robert D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTiffany, Robert D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2022 |
CategoryReduced Mortgage Redemption |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Affidavit of Not Found
Date: July 11, 2022Proposed Order or Document
Date: July 14, 2022Proposed Order or Document
Date: June 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Filed By: Attorney ROSSMAN, JOSEPH MATTHEW Index #19 | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #18 | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Order-Other Judicial Officer: Tiffany, Robert D. Index #17 | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #16 | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Filed By: Attorney ROSSMAN, JOSEPH MATTHEW Index #15 | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Not Found | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.