Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Annette, Tyler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnnette, Tyler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2022 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
Matter TypeName Change |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: August 24, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: August 29, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: August 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing Held Remote | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Submissions-Under Advisement
Judge: Annette, Tyler |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
August 24, 2022 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions | |
August 23, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing Held Remote | |
August 01, 2022 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Criminal Background Check - Name Change | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Application for Name Change | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Consent to Criminal Background Check |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.