Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Koebnick, Mark, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Paulson, Cody Allen, in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Schieferdecker, Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchieferdecker, Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2022 |
CategoryReplevin |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
Matter TypeCollections |
Affidavit of Service Index #4
Date: May 25, 2022Civil Cover Sheet Index #3
Date: May 25, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: May 25, 2022Summons Index #2
Date: May 25, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Schieferdecker, Eric P. Index #5
Date: September 14, 2022Notice of Deficiency Index #6
Date: September 14, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #9
Date: January 10, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #8
Date: November 15, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #7
Date: October 14, 2022Answer Filed By: Defendant Paulson, Cody Allen Index #10
Date: January 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Schieferdecker, Eric P. |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer Filed By: Defendant Paulson, Cody Allen Index #10 | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Index # 10
Judge: Schieferdecker, Eric P. |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #9 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 9
Judge: Schieferdecker, Eric P. |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Schieferdecker, Eric P. |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #8 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Schieferdecker, Eric P. |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 8
Judge: Schieferdecker, Eric P. |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #7 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.