Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rasmussen, Lowell, Rasmussen, Mary, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Gateway Upholstery, in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Tiffany, Robert D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTiffany, Robert D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
|
Statement of Claim Filed By: Plaintiff Rasmussen, Lowell; Plaintiff Rasmussen, Mary Index #1
Date: October 11, 2022Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Gateway Upholstery Index #9
Date: December 27, 2022Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #7
Date: December 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Gateway Upholstery Index #9 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #7 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #8 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #6 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Tiffany, Robert D. |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 6 (Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler )
Judge: Tiffany, Robert D. |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Gateway Upholstery Index #5 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 5
Judge: Tiffany, Robert D. |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4 | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index #2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.