Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tbfw, Llp, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Deutsch, John, in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
|
Judgment Index #10
Date: June 21, 2023Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #11
Date: June 21, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4
Date: September 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Index #12 | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #10 | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #11 | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #9 | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #7 | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler )
Judge: Annette, Tyler |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #6 | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 6 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.