Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Gallwas, Alexander Connor - Lead Attorney, against Karl, Jody L, in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
|
Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #7
Date: December 29, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #8
Date: December 30, 2022Statement of Claim Filed By: Attorney GALLWAS, ALEXANDER CONNOR Index #1
Date: July 27, 2022Correspondence Index #2
Date: July 27, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #5
Date: October 04, 2022Summons Index #3
Date: August 04, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4
Date: August 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #9 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #8 | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #7 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #6 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 6 (Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler )
Judge: Annette, Tyler |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #5 | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 5 | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index #3 | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.