Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Range Credit Bureau Inc., filed a(n) Conciliation case against Heyer, Miranda, in the jurisdiction of Hubbard County, MN, . Hubbard County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHubbard County, MN |
|
Statement of Claim
Date: June 23, 2022Judgment Index #8
Date: September 15, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #7
Date: September 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #10 | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #8 | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #9 | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #7 | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Annette, Tyler Index #6 | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Annette, Tyler |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Power of Attorney Index #5 | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Power of Attorney | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index #2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.