Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Commitment Hearing filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent case in the jurisdiction of Freeborn County, MN, . Freeborn County, MN Superior Courts with Leuning, Ross presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeuning, Ross Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFreeborn County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Distributed | |
March 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Index # 62 | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 61 | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Continued Commitment Index # 60 (Judicial Officer: Leuning, Ross L. )
Judge: Leuning, Ross L. |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 58 | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Continued Commitment - Mentally Ill (Judicial Officer: Leuning, Ross L.) Commitment ( Commissioner of Human Services , 12 Mo , Conditions, other , 06/08/2023)
Judge: Leuning, Ross L. |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Continued Commitment - Chemically Dependent (Judicial Officer: Leuning, Ross L.) Commitment ( Commissioner of Human Services , 12 Mo , Conditions, other , 06/08/2023)
Judge: Leuning, Ross L. |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 57 | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Examiner Index # 56 (Judicial Officer: Leuning, Ross L. )
Judge: Leuning, Ross L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.