Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Espe, Marlin, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Wagner, Wilhelmina J., in the jurisdiction of Freeborn County, MN, . Freeborn County, MN Superior Courts with Hormann, Christy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHormann, Christy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFreeborn County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Hormann, Christy Index #10
Date: October 18, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Defendant Wagner, Wilhelmina J. Index #11
Date: October 19, 2022Certify Personal Service Index #6
Date: October 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #18 | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #19 | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Index #17 | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Hormann, Christy Index #15 | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #16 | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held In-Person | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Hormann, Christy Index #14 | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Defendant Wagner, Wilhelmina J. Index #11 | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Plaintiff Espe, Marlin; Defendant Wagner, Wilhelmina J. Index #13 | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Trial Judicial Officer: Neisen, Christopher A. Index #12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.