Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Implied Consent case in the jurisdiction of Freeborn County, MN, . Freeborn County, MN Superior Courts with Hormann, Christy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHormann, Christy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2022 |
CategoryImplied Consent |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationFreeborn County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit-Other Index # 14
Judge: Hormann, Christy |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 13
Judge: Hormann, Christy |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Hormann, Christy |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Respondent Index # 12
Judge: Hormann, Christy |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Other Document Index # 11
Judge: Hormann, Christy |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Respondent Index # 10
Judge: Hormann, Christy |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer Index # 9
Judge: Hormann, Christy |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 8
Judge: Hormann, Christy |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Continuance Index # 7
Judge: Hormann, Christy |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 6
Judge: Hormann, Christy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.