Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Freeborn County, MN, . Freeborn County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFreeborn County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 6 | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 5 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index # 3 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 4 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim Index # 1 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Conciliation Court Filing Fee Index # 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.