Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Freeborn County, MN, . Freeborn County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFreeborn County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Determination Index # 16 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index # 15 | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 14 | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Determination Index # 13 | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Substitution of Counsel Index # 12 | |
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 11 | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 10 | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Determination Index # 9 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.