Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chisago County Health And Human Services, filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill case against Endrizzi, James Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Seabrooks II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSeabrooks II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2023 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Petitioner Chisago County Health and Human Services; Respondent Endrizzi, James Anthony; Attorney REITER, JANET; Attorney SCHNEIDER, JAMES F Index #30 | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Proceeding and Discharging Patient Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #29 | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #28 | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Physician's Statement Index #27 | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | 60-90 Day Commitment Report Index #26 | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #25 | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Commitment Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #24 | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.