Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Commitment Hearing filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill case in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2022 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. )
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judicial Determination Index # 28 (Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. )
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 29 | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index # 27 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 24 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 26 | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Second Examiner Index # 23 (Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse )
Judge: Seabrooks II, Jesse |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Examiner Index # 25 (Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse )
Judge: Seabrooks II, Jesse |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.