Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chisago County Health And Human Services, filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill case against Dumke, Neena Grace, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Trevino, Catherine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrevino, Catherine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2022 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Petitioner Chisago County Health and Human Services; Respondent Dumke, Neena Grace; Attorney PETERSON, TIMOTHY J; Attorney REITER, JANET; Name Not Available Online Index #29 | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Proceeding and Discharging Patient Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #28 | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #27 | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Physician's Statement Index #25 | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | 60-90 Day Commitment Report Index #26 | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Provisional Discharge Index #24 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #23 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Commitment and Treatment with NTP Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #22 | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.