Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wolhaupter, John, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Wolhaupter, Maureen, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Dowdal, Bridgid presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDowdal, Bridgid Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Petition to Terminate and Discharge of Guardian-Conservator Index #24
Date: June 22, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #21
Date: March 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #27 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Guardianship and Discharging Guardian Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Filed By: Guardian Wolhaupter, John; Petitioner Wolhaupter, John Index #26 | |
July 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition to Terminate and Discharge of Guardian-Conservator Index #24 | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Death Certificate Filed By: Respondent Wolhaupter, Maureen; Person Subject To Guardianship Wolhaupter, Maureen Index #25 | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DHS Background Check Filed By: Guardian Wolhaupter, John; Petitioner Wolhaupter, John Index #23 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DHS Background Check Filed By: Guardian Wolhaupter, John; Petitioner Wolhaupter, John Index #22 | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #21 | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator Index #20 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting Guardianship Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Filed By: Guardian Wolhaupter, John; Petitioner Wolhaupter, John Index #16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.