Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cherokee Place Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Hage, Brian Elliot - Lead Attorney, against Linder, Todd W., Linder, Wendy K., in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole Index #4
Date: January 09, 2023Eviction Summons Index #2
Date: December 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney HAGE, BRIAN ELLIOT; Defendant Linder, Todd W.; Defendant Linder, Wendy K. Index #5 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole Index #4 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole )
Judge: Kralik, Nicole |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #3 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 3 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index #2 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index # 2 | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil Index #1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.