Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Civil Other/Misc. case represented by Peterson, Theresa Anne - Lead Attorney, against B., D., in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Trevino, Catherine A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrevino, Catherine A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Other/Misc. |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Affidavit of Service Index #18
Date: October 25, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney PETERSON, THERESA ANNE Index #25
Date: December 07, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #21
Date: November 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney PETERSON, THERESA ANNE Index #25 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Structured Settlement Order Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #24 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #23 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. )
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Substitution of Counsel Index #22 | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Counsel Index # 22
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #21 | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Other Document Index #20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.