Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fairview Health Services, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Sandy, Christina Rae - Lead Attorney, against Barnes, Cody S, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Summons Index #2
Date: November 08, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Plaintiff FAIRVIEW HEALTH SERVICES Index #3
Date: November 08, 2022Certify Personal Service Index #4
Date: November 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #8 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #6 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Defendant Barnes, Cody S; Attorney SANDY, CHRISTINA RAE Index #7 | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole Index #5 | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant Barnes, Cody S | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index #4 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 4 | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index #2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.