Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Hicks, William C - Lead Attorney, against Vang, Mao, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: October 18, 2022Judgment Index #6
Date: December 09, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #7
Date: December 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #8 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #6 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #7 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole Index #5 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant Vang, Mao | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index #2 | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3 | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Filed By: Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC; Defendant Vang, Mao Index #4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.