Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fairview Health Services, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Sandy, Christina Rae - Lead Attorney, against Huffman, Donald J, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: October 12, 2022Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #8
Date: March 03, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: October 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #8 | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #6 | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #7 | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole Index #5 | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant Huffman, Donald J | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3 | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index #2 | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Filed By: Plaintiff FAIRVIEW HEALTH SERVICES; Defendant Huffman, Donald J Index #4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.