Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ostrom, Stephanie A, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Loughney, Tracey E, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Summons Index #3
Date: October 12, 2022Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: October 11, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Plaintiff Ostrom, Stephanie A Index #4
Date: October 12, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: October 11, 2022Proof of Service Index #7
Date: November 09, 2022Affidavit of Service Filed By: Plaintiff Ostrom, Stephanie A Index #5
Date: October 31, 2022Affidavit of Service Filed By: Plaintiff Ostrom, Stephanie A Index #6
Date: October 31, 2022Agreement Judicial Officer: Watchke-Koranne, James Index #8
Date: November 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Defendant Loughney, Tracey E; Plaintiff Ostrom, Stephanie A Index #9 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreement Judicial Officer: Watchke-Koranne, James Index #8 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Watchke-Koranne, James | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Index #7 | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Index # 7 | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Filed By: Plaintiff Ostrom, Stephanie A Index #5 | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Filed By: Plaintiff Ostrom, Stephanie A Index #6 | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 6 | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.