Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, MI, . Otsego County, MI Superior Courts with HUNTER,COLIN G., presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHUNTER,COLIN G., Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOtsego County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRETRIAL HEARING
Judge: HUNTER, COLIN G. |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER STIPULATED ORDER FOR ADJOURNMENT OF PRETRIAL HRG DATE ON 10/6/22 Judge: HUNTER,COLIN G., |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO 1/6/23 @2:15 W/CGH FILED Judge: HUNTER,COLIN G., |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
REMOVE SCHEDULED EVENT Prof: J 071821 Next Action of PTH on 10/06/2022 at 2:00 PM Seq #003 Judge: HUNTER,COLIN G., |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
REMOVE SCHEDULED EVENT EMAILED TO COUNSEL, ORIG TO CLK. Judge: HUNTER,COLIN G., |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
REMOVE SCHEDULED EVENT Calendar item has been Inactivated for: Judge: HUNTER,COLIN G., |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
SET CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: HUNTER,COLIN G., |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
REMOVE SCHEDULED EVENT STIPULATED ORDER FOR ADJOURNMENT OF PRETRIAL ON 10/6/22 SIGNED, Judge: HUNTER,COLIN G., |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
REFEREE FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION AFTER HRG ON CUSTODY, PARENTING TIME & CHILD SUPPORT; CERT OF Judge: HUNTER,COLIN G., |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
REFEREE FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION MAILING FILED Judge: HUNTER,COLIN G., |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.