Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Colpoys-Mcewen, Claudia, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Meijer Inc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2022 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (CLAUDIA COLPOYS-MCEWEN) (5/23/23 @ 2 PM) & POS DANIEL J. JAMES (Attorney) on behalf of MEIJER INC (DEFENDANT) | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MEIJER INC'S LAY AND EXPERT WITNESS LIST, POS DANIEL J. JAMES (Attorney) on behalf of MEIJER INC (DEFENDANT) | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | POS OF DEFS' RESPONSES TO PLA'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION STATUS REPORT (NOT HELD) OTHER: | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR REFERRAL FOR MEDIATION | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | APPOINTMENT AS MEDIATOR LETTER (MEDIATOR: THOMAS BEHM) | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOT HELD - ORDER TO FOLLOW The following event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE scheduled for 02/15/2023 at 2:00 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: NOT HELD - ORDER TO FOLLOW Judge: TRUSOCK, HONORABLE MARK A Location: Https://miscao.zoom.us/j/7398420916 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | POS OF DEF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES, INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION & POS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.