Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Hadfield, Charles Gregory, Hadfield, Karen, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Advanced Radiology Services Pc, Notrnicola M.D., Jon-Eric, Spectrum Health Hospitals, Spectrum Health System, Spectrum Health Systems, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2022 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFS ADVANCED RADIOLOGY SERVICES PC, JON-ERIC NOTARNICOLA MD, SPECTRUM HEALTH SYSTEM AND SPECTRUM HEALTH HOSPITALS d/b/a LEMMEN-HOLTON CANCER PAVILION AND BETTY FORD BREAST CARE SERVICES WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION STATUS REPORT (HELD/SETTLED) PARTIES SETTLED | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION STATUS REPORT (HELD/SETTLED) PARTIES SETTLED | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | POS NOTICE OF TAKING DUCES TECUM DEPOSITION OF JENNIFER ROLLENHANGE, M.D. & POS | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | POS OF NOTICE OF TAKING DUCES TECUM DEPOSITION OF ANDREW SCHNEIDER M.D., POS | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY EXHIBIT LIST ROBERT M. WYNGAARDEN (Attorney) on behalf of DR JON-ERIC NOTRNICOLA M.D., ADVANCED RADIOLOGY SERVICES PC (DEFENDANT) | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFS. ADVANCED RADIOLOGY SERVICES, P.C. AND JON-ERIC NOTARNICOLA, M.D.'S PRELIMINARY LAY WITNESS LIST D. BENJAMIN M. BARTH (Attorney) on behalf of DR JON-ERIC NOTRNICOLA M.D., ADVANCED RADIOLOGY SERVICES PC (DEFENDANT) | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFS. ADVANCED RADIOLOGY SERVICES, P.C. AND JON-ERIC NOTARNICOLA, M.D.'S EXPERT WITNESS LIST D. BENJAMIN M. BARTH (Attorney) on behalf of DR JON-ERIC NOTRNICOLA M.D., ADVANCED RADIOLOGY SERVICES PC (DEFENDANT) | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFS. SPECTRUM HEALTH SYSTEM AND SPECTRUM HEALTH HOSPITALS' LAY WITNESS LIST, EXPERT WITNESS LIST AND PRELIMINARY EXHIBIT LIST, POS DAVID JOSEPH BUSSCHER (Attorney) on behalf of SPECTRUM HEALTH SYSTEMS, SPECTRUM HEALTH SYSTEM (DEFENDANT) | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | POS (DEFENDANTS ADVANCED RADIOLOGY SERVICES PC AND JON-ERIC NOTARNICOLA MD'S EXPERT WITNESS LIST; DEFENDANTS ADVANCED RADIOLOGY SERVICES PC AND JON-ERIC NOTARNICOLA MD'S PRELIMINARY LAY WITNESS LIST; AND PRELIMINARY EXHIBIT LIST ON BEHALF OD DEFENDANTS ADVANCED RADIOLOGY SERVICES PC AND JON-ERIC NOTARNICOLA MD) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.