Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Barreira, Saray Lopes, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Michigan Unemployment Insurance Agency, Pvi Industrial Cleaning, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2022 |
CategoryEmployment Security Commission |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOT HELD - ORDER TO FOLLOW The following event: MISCELLANEOUS MOTION scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 9:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: NOT HELD - ORDER TO FOLLOW Judge: DENENFELD, HONORABLE PAUL J Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #11D | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING APPEAL (THE COURT GRANTS THE AGENCY'S APPEAL AND REVERSES THE COMMISSION'S 10/19/22 DECISION) | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | RENOTICE OF HEARING (UNEMPLOYMENT APPEAL) (5/26/23 @ 9 AM), POS JESSICA ROSE SMITH (Attorney) on behalf of MICHIGAN UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE AGENCY (DEFENDANT) | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED Event: MISCELLANEOUS MOTION Date: 05/26/2023 Time: 9:00 am Judge: DENENFELD, HONORABLE PAUL J Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #11D Result: NOT HELD - ORDER TO FOLLOW | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | RE-NOTICE OF HEARING (ORAL ARGUMENT FOR AGENCY/APPELLANT'S UNEMPLOYMENT APPEAL) (4/21/23 AT 9:00 AM) AND POS JESSICA ROSE SMITH (Attorney) on behalf of MICHIGAN UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE AGENCY (DEFENDANT) | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRECTED RE-NOTICE OF HEARING (ORAL ARGUMENT FOR AGENCY/APPELLANT'S UNEMPLOYMENT APPEAL) (4/21/23 AT 9:00 AM) AND POS JESSICA ROSE SMITH (Attorney) on behalf of MICHIGAN UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE AGENCY (DEFENDANT) | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | POS OF BRIEF OF APPELLANT MICHIGAN UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE AGENCY | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | BRIEF OF APPELLANT MICHIGAN UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE AGENCY - ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED, POS JESSICA ROSE SMITH (Attorney) on behalf of MICHIGAN UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE AGENCY (DEFENDANT) | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | BRIEF OF APPELLANT MICHIGAN UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE AGENCY - ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED, POS JESSICA ROSE SMITH (Attorney) on behalf of MICHIGAN UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE AGENCY (DEFENDANT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.