Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Bsrep Ii Mh Heritage Capital Llc, Llc By Its Servicer Triad Financial Services Inc, filed a(n) Claim And Delivery case against And Any And All Unknown Tenants, Kuikstra, Chelsea D, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2022 |
CategoryClaim And Delivery |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | POS OF ORDER OF POSSESSION (SERVED ON 5/9/23) | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | POS OF ORDER OF POSSESSION AND RETURN ON DELIVERY OF PROPERTY TO PLA | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | POS OF DEFAULT ORDER OF POSSESSION AND WRIT OF RESTITUTION & POS | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ORDER OF POSSESSION AND WRIT OF RESTITUTION | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTED The following event: MOTION FOR DEFAULT scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 8:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: MOTION GRANTED Judge: ELMORE, HONORABLE CHRISTINA Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 665 859 4577 HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: FTR 10C Certificate #: | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED Event: MOTION FOR DEFAULT Date: 04/14/2023 Time: 8:30 am Judge: ELMORE, HONORABLE CHRISTINA Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 665 859 4577 Result: MOTION GRANTED | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, NOTICE OF HEARING (4/14/23 AT 8:30 AM) VIA ZOOM AND POS AARON FRANKLIN BAYLISS (Attorney) on behalf of BSREP II MH HERITAGE CAPITAL LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 1306849 Date: 04/03/2023 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | POS OF DEFAULT REQUEST AND ENTRY & POS | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT REQUEST AND ENTRY AND ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS (DEFENDANT); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.