Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Auto Owners Insurance Company, filed a(n) Product Liability case against Bekins Inc, Ez-Flo International Inc, Reliance Worldwide Corporation, Reliance Worldwide Holdings International Llc, Whirlpool Corporation, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2022 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION (9/25/24 @ 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM) | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | PLA'S ANSWERS TO DEF. BECKINS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, POS RICHARD A. MARVIN (Attorney) on behalf of AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (PLAINTIFF) | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | NOT HELD - ORDER TO FOLLOW The following event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE scheduled for 02/21/2024 at 2:00 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: NOT HELD - ORDER TO FOLLOW Judge: TRUSOCK, HONORABLE MARK A Location: Https://miscao.zoom.us/j/7398420916 | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | DEF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES, REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, NOTICE OF NON-PARTY AT FAULT AND POS TARALYNN T. VELTING (Attorney) on behalf of BEKINS INC (DEFENDANT) | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (2/21/24 @ 2PM VIA ZOOM) & POS | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (NOTICE & PROOF) Event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Date: 02/21/2024 Time: 2:00 pm Judge: TRUSOCK, HONORABLE MARK A Location: Https://miscao.zoom.us/j/7398420916 Result: NOT HELD - ORDER TO FOLLOW | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | DEF. BEKINS, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, POS TARALYNN T. VELTING (Attorney) on behalf of BEKINS INC (DEFENDANT) | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY & POS TARALYNN T. VELTING (Attorney) on behalf of BEKINS INC (DEFENDANT) | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND Receipt: 1345990 Date: 12/21/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.