Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lakeland Hospitals At Niles, St. Joseph Inc, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2021 |
CategoryNo-Fault Automobile Insurance |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | OVERPAYMENT RELEASE - MILLER JOHNSON Check Issued: 11/30/22 Check #468730 $25.00 Payable to: MILLER JOHNSON. | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (NOTICE & PROOF) Event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Date: 12/14/2022 Time: 2:00 pm Judge: TRUSOCK, HONORABLE MARK A Location: Https://miscao.zoom.us/j/7398420916 | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON 12/14/2022 @ 2:00 PM VIA ZOOM & POS | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | OVERPAYMENT Receipt: 1285143 Date: 11/03/2022 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORD OF CASE RECEIVED FROM 61ST DISTRICT COURT (22-GC-0000010) | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | FILING FEES FOR NEW CASE Receipt: 1285143 Date: 11/03/2022 | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION FROM DISTRICT COURT TO CIRCUIT COURT (61ST) | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE & ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (61ST DISTRICT) | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED (61ST DISTRICT) STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT); | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (61ST DISTRICT) STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.