Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Advisacare Home Healthcare Solutions Inc, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case against Fremont Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2022 |
CategoryNo-Fault Automobile Insurance |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | DEF'S ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAS' FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEF. FREMONT INSURANCE COMPANY AND POS HEIDI J. GEHART (Attorney) on behalf of FREMONT INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT) | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION W/22-08437-NF / 22-08437-NF IS LEAD CASE | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PLA'S TRIAL WITNESS LIST, PLA'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT FREMONT INSURANCE COMPANY & POS STEPHEN JAY HULST (Attorney) on behalf of ADVISACARE HOME HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS INC (PLAINTIFF) | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER CONSOLIDATIING CASES AND ADJOURNING SCHEDULING ORDER (WITH CASE NO. 22-084374-NF) (COPY) | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | SECOND RE-NOTICE OF MEDIATION (3/4/24 AT 9:00 AM) VIA ZOOM | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S LAY AND EXPERT WITNESS LIST, POS STEPHEN JAY HULST (Attorney) on behalf of ADVISACARE HOME HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS INC (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | RE-NOTICE OF MEDIATION (10/10/23 AT 1:30 PM) VIA ZOOM | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOT HEARD, ORDER ENTERED The following event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE scheduled for 06/28/2023 at 10:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: NOT HEARD, ORDER ENTERED Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON 6/28/2023 @ 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM & POS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.