Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Advisacare Home Health Solutions Inc, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case against Nationwide Insurance Company Of America, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2022 |
CategoryNo-Fault Automobile Insurance |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (4/17/24 @ 10 AM) VIA ZOOM & POS | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ADJOURNED DUE TO OTHER REASONS The following event: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 03/20/2024 at 10:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: ADJOURNED DUE TO OTHER REASONS Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICE & PROOF) The following event: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 03/20/2024 at 10:00 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 04/17/2024 Time: 10:00 am Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | DEF'S FIRST AMENDED TRIAL WITNESS LIST & POS LAWRENCE JOHN POCHRON JR (Attorney) on behalf of NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (DEFENDANT) | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICE & PROOF) Event: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 03/20/2024 Time: 10:00 am Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 Result: ADJOURNED DUE TO OTHER REASONS | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (3/20/24 @ 10 AM VIA ZOOM) & POS | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE The following event: MOTION TO COMPEL scheduled for 02/15/2024 at 1:30 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED The following event: MOTION TO COMPEL scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 1:30 pm has been rescheduled as follows: Event: MOTION TO COMPEL Date: 02/15/2024 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 Result: ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | RESCHEDULED EVENT The following event: MOTION TO COMPEL scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 1:30 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: RESCHEDULED EVENT Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 | |
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | RENOTICE OF HEARING FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION(S) ON 02/15/2024 @ 1:30PM & POS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.