Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Nelson, Keith M, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Michigan Unemployment Insurance Agency, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2022 |
CategoryEmployment Security Commission |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM THE COURT OF APPEALS, DATED 10/5/23 (COA # 365243) (APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL IS GRANTED) | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRANSMISSION TO THE COURT OF APPEALS (#365243 ) (KEITH NELSON AND BARI WOOD) | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CONTENT OF TRANSMISSION TO THE COURT OF APPEALS (#365243) | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CLAIM OF APPEAL FEE Receipt: 1304110 Date: 03/16/2023 | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MICHIGAN UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE AGENCY'S CLAIM OF APPEAL, POS | |
December 14, 2022 | BRIEF OF APPEALLANT MICHIGAN UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE AGENCY, ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED AND POS BARI BLAKE WOOD (Attorney) on behalf of MICHIGAN UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE AGENCY (DEFENDANT) | ||
November 16, 2022 | NOTICE TO PARTIES OF RECORD FILED IN CIRCUIT COURT AND POS | ||
November 14, 2022 | RECORD ON APPEAL RECEIVED FROM THE UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS COMMISSION | ||
November 14, 2022 | CERTIFICATION OF AND RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS BY UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS COMMISSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.