Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Van Dyke, Ryan, filed a(n) Business Claims case against Harbor Foam Inc, Kuperus, Laura, Kuperus, Tate, Van Dyke, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2022 |
CategoryBusiness Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CANCELLED-CASE STAYED The following event: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 12/06/2023 at 10:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: CANCELLED Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT-COURTROOM #10D | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER STAYING CASE | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | CANCELLED-CASE SETTLED The following event: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 9:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: CANCELLED Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT-COURTROOM #10D | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER (RE: PLAS' APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ADJOURNED TO 4/25/23 AT 9:00 AM) | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | RENOTICE OF HEARING (MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) (4/25/23 @ 9 AM) PAUL A. MCCARTHY (Attorney) on behalf of RYAN VAN DYKE (PLAINTIFF) | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | POS OF RE-NOTICE OF HEARING & POS | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED The following event: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION scheduled for 04/26/2023 at 9:00 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Date: 04/25/2023 Time: 9:00 am Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT-COURTROOM #10D Result: CANCELLED | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | RESCHEDULED EVENT The following event: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION scheduled for 04/26/2023 at 9:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: RESCHEDULED EVENT Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED The following event: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 9:00 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Date: 04/26/2023 Time: 1:00 pm Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 Result: RESCHEDULED EVENT | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ADJOURNED DUE TO OTHER REASONS-PER PARTIES The following event: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 9:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: ADJOURNED DUE TO OTHER REASONS Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.