Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case against Kelsie Dunham, in the jurisdiction of Ingham County, MI, . Ingham County, MI Superior Courts with DONALD ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDONALD ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIngham County, MI |
|
Case Outcome Type6Bc-Transfer - 09/27/2022 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | SPECIALTY COURT JUDGE REASSIGNMENT: THE JUDGE WAS CHANGED FROM JAMO, JAMES S TO ALLEN JR., DONALD L. | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE THAT CASE TRANSFERRED VIA EMAIL TO 55TH DISTRICT | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED C30 | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT FROM JUDGE JAMO TO JUDGE DONALD ALLEN FOR 55 SPECIALTY COURT | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SET: EVENT: JURY TRIAL CRIMINAL DATE: 01/30/2023 TIME: 8:30 AM JUDGE: JAMO, JAMES S LOCATION: COURTROOM 7 - VETERANS MEMORIAL | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING HELD ON THE RECORD THE FOLLOWING EVENT: CRIMINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/01/2022 AT 2:30 PM HAS BEEN RESULTED AS FOLLOWS: RESULT: HEARING HELD ON THE RECORD JUDGE: JAMO, JAMES S LOCATION: COURTROOM 7 - VETERANS MEMORIAL 0001 | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING IN OPEN COURT/CRIMINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IN PERSON ON 9-1-22 - APA MOTION TO ADJOURN AS A PLEA IS BEING WORKED OUT - APA STATED THAT THIS CASE WILL BE TRANSFERRED TO 55TH DISTRICT SOBRIETY COURT - ORDER TO BE PRESENTED TO THE COURT | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ADJOURNED ON THE RECORD THE FOLLOWING EVENT: JURY TRIAL CRIMINAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/13/2022 AT 8:30 AM HAS BEEN RESULTED AS FOLLOWS: RESULT: C30 ADJOURNED - ON THE RECORD JUDGE: JAMO, JAMES S LOCATION: COURTROOM 7 - VETERANS MEMORIAL RESULT ST0001 | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | CHANGE IN CONTACT (NOTICE) | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SET: THE FOLLOWING EVENT: JURY TRIAL CRIMINAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/2022 AT 8:30 AM HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED AS FOLLOWS: EVENT: JURY TRIAL CRIMINAL DATE: 09/13/2022 TIME: 8:30 AM JUDGE: JAMO, JAMES S LOCATION: COURTROOM 7 - VETERANS 0001 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.