Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Beneficial California Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jacobs, Kurtiss Anthony, against Clark, John D., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond A. Guadagni Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2007 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time161 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Beneficial California Inc. vs. Clark, J. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Apr 25 2007 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 932210 - Attorney for Defendant NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT [932210] |
|
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) 212320-Proof of Service: Summons (DLR) Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE: SUMMONS (DLR) [212320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUMMONS: FILED [222120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff COMPLAINT [212210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.