Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Decker, Stephanie, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts Worcester County Probate and Family Court with Tetreau, Hon. Roxann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTetreau, Hon. Roxann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Managed |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseWorcester County Probate and Family Court |
Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody
Date: September 07, 2021Order Dated 9-7-2021 Appointing Temporary Guardian Judge: Bailey, Hon. Kathryn M.
Date: September 08, 2021Motion For Speedy Hearing ALLOWED on 09/07/2021 File Reference # 5
Date: September 08, 2021Temporary Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Temporary Bond Approved of Temporary Guardian dated 09/07/2021, by Hon. Kathryn M. Bailey
Date: September 08, 2021Request For Emergency Hearing and Waiver of Notice
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Dated 9-7-2021 Appointing Temporary Guardian Judge: Bailey, Hon. Kathryn M. | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion For Speedy Hearing ALLOWED on 09/07/2021 File Reference # 5 | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Bond Approved of Temporary Guardian dated 09/07/2021, by Hon. Kathryn M. Bailey | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority (Guardianship of a Minor) Sent On: 09/08/2021 09:46:08 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Bond Without Sureties Filed | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Request For Emergency Hearing and Waiver of Notice | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Track assignment notice issued. A NOTICE: Track Assignment Notice 8 Month Track was generated and sent to: Petitioner, Attorney: Stefanie Manuela Roberts, Esq. Law Offices of Stefanie M. Roberts, P.C. 142 Main St, Leominster, MA 01453 Biological Mother: Andrea E. LaVigne No addresses available Biological Mother: Christopher J. Foley 106 Burncoat Street, Worcester, MA 01605 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appointment of Guardian of a Minor issued. Hearing date 10/15/2021 08:30 AM Guardianship of Minor Hearing. | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.