Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
W.L. French Excavating Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wecker, Esq., Ross C, against Gilbane Building Company, Madison Wg Holdings, Llc, Madison Wg Holdings Llc, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet Kenton-Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2022 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: February 07, 2022Complaint electronically filed.
Date: February 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal, Madison WG Holdings LLC failed to comply with an ORDER of the Court dated 02/07/2023. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: The Plaintiff, having failed to comply with the Court's 02/07/23 Order, the plaintiff's complaint be and hereby is dismissed. Entered and Copies Mailed 4/5/23 | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendant Madison WG Holdings LLC: Defaulted under time standards; The Plaintiff shall file a motion for default Judgment and Assessment of Damages by 03/07/23 or the complaint shall be dismissed. | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL (1-88), service not completed for some parties by deadline review: Judge: Kenton-Walker, Hon. Janet
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Acceptance of Service (E-FILED) Applies To: Gilbane Building Company (Defendant) | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Madison WG Holdings, LLC; Service made through agent/person in charge on 4/29/22 (E-FILED) | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 02/08/2022 | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Appoint Special Process Server (#3.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 2/9/22 Judge: Wrenn, Hon. Daniel M | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff W.l. French Excavating Corporation's Motion to appoint special process server. (E-FILED) Dewsnap & Associates, LLC | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.