Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ford, Amanda, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Eikelberg, Esq., Ashly W, Zodikoff, Esq., Alexander, against 45-49 Elizabeth St. Realty Tr, represented by Palmer, Esq., Peter A, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Valerie A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValerie A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 03/13/2024 Time: 09:00 AM | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Conference Memorandum Joint Pretrial Memorandum [E-FILED] Applies To: Ford, Amanda (Plaintiff); 45-49 Elizabeth St. Realty Tr (Defendant) | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 06/29/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR2:33 PM Hon. Daniel M Wrenn, Presiding Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Wrenn, Daniel M |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Applies To: Eikelberg, Esq., Ashly W (Attorney) on behalf of Ford, Amanda (Plaintiff) | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Amanda Ford's Notice of Withdrawal (E-FILED) Applies To: Zodikoff, Esq., Alexander (Attorney) on behalf of Ford, Amanda (Plaintiff) | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference (#9.0): ALLOWED Notice Sent 12/21/22 Judge: Yarashus, Hon. Valerie A | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 12/21/2022 08:58:44 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 12/21/2022 08:56:43 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 01/05/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Janet Kenton-Walker, Presiding
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Amanda Ford's Joint Motion to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference [E-FILED] Applies To: Ford, Amanda (Plaintiff); 45-49 Elizabeth St. Realty Tr (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.